MO SB566 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Campus Intellectual Diversity Act" to create offices of public policy events at each public institution of higher education
Title
Establishes the "Campus Intellectual Diversity Act" to create offices of public policy events at each public institution of higher education
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | S First Read |