MO SB559 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 559-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Missouri Statewide Mechanical Contractor Licensing Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Missouri Statewide Mechanical Contractor Licensing Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 559-Schatz, with SCS
2020-04-28SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-02-20SenateReported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS
2020-02-17SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3329S.04C)
2020-01-27SenateHearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 559-Schatz
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback