MO SB543 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SS for SB 543-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SS for SB 543-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agricultural land values for property tax purposes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agricultural land values for property tax purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SS for SB 543-Munzlinger |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(4577S.03F) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 543-Munzlinger |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723534 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB543.pdf |