MO SB538 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 538, 562 & 601-Libla, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 538, 562 & 601-Libla, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies penalties relating to criminal offenses involving deadly weapons
Title
Modifies penalties relating to criminal offenses involving deadly weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 538, 562 & 601-Libla, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(3891S05.01S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Libla)--(3891S.05F) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee /wSCS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 538, 562 & 601) Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3891S.04C) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 538-Libla |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |