MO SB520 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4119S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4119S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the period of detention on arrest without a warrant to 48 hours
Title
Changes the period of detention on arrest without a warrant to 48 hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4119S.03C) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 520-Curls |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |