MO SB511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a website operator from intentionally using an internet domain name in a ticket website’s URL that contains certain information
Title
Prohibits a website operator from intentionally using an internet domain name in a ticket website’s URL that contains certain information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 511-Williams |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5255850 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB511.pdf |