MO SB503 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Committee for 911 Oversight to designate a state 911 coordinator
Title
Requires the Committee for 911 Oversight to designate a state 911 coordinator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 112 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 503 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 503 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 112 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 503 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 503 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 503 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(2199S02.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (2199S02.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | S conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Koenig, Kraus, Curls, Hummel |
2017-05-11 | House | H conferees appointed: Lauer, Engler, Rhoads, McCreery, Franks Jr. |
2017-05-11 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-11 | House | S refuses to concur in HA1, HA 2 & HA 3 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(2199S01.17H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(2199S01.23H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Lauer)--(2199S01.29H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2017-03-30 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 503-Munzlinger |