MO SB5 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions regarding tax credits and the corporate income tax
Title
Modifies several provisions regarding tax credits and the corporate income tax
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 5-Lager |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=16944780 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB5.pdf |