MO SB488 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to mortgage loan originators
Title
Modifies provisions relating to mortgage loan originators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2015-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Banking |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Banking |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Banking |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Banking |
2015-04-27 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-23 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 488-Cunningham |