MO SB483 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 483-Holsman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 483-Holsman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a requirement for motor vehicles to stop at railroad tracks when on-track equipment other than a train is approaching
Title
Adds a requirement for motor vehicles to stop at railroad tracks when on-track equipment other than a train is approaching
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 483-Holsman |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 483-Holsman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=61195994 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB483.pdf |