MO SB475 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 475-Lamping
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 475-Lamping
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the joint election of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Title
Requires the joint election of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 475-Lamping | |
2012-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-29 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2012-03-26 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 475-Lamping | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB475.pdf |