MO SB473 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes discipline against real estate licensees related to advertisement
Title
Authorizes discipline against real estate licensees related to advertisement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | S First Read |