MO SB469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 469-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 469-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for an appropriation to cooperate with political subdivisions on land clearance projects related to tourism infrastructure facilities
Title
Allows for an appropriation to cooperate with political subdivisions on land clearance projects related to tourism infrastructure facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 469-Schatz |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 469-Schatz |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=60748006 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB469.pdf |