MO SB46 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 46 & 50-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 6 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies several provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies several provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 46 & 50-Koenig, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 6 (pending)
2019-03-06SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-06SenateSA 6 to SS for SCS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--( 0531S14.03S)
2019-03-06SenateSA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(0531S14.21S)
2019-03-06SenateSA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hough)--(0531S14.20S)
2019-03-06SenateSA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(0531S14.17S)
2019-03-06SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(0531S14.14S)
2019-03-06SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Burlison)--(0531S14.12S)
2019-03-06SenateSS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(0531S.14F)
2019-02-25SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-14SenateSCS Reported from S Ways and Means Committee
2019-02-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 46 & 50) Ways and Means Committee (0531S.05C)
2019-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2019-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 46-Koenig
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback