MO SB457 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 457-Schmitt, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 457-Schmitt, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of mandatory reporting of child sexual abuse
Title
Modifies provisions of mandatory reporting of child sexual abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 457-Schmitt, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending) | |
2012-02-20 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-20 | SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(4432S.06F) | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-06 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4432S.05C) | |
2012-01-23 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 457-Schmitt | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |