MO SB455 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to benevolent tax credits
Title
Modifies provisions relating to benevolent tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee w/SCS |
2023-04-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee (1760S.03C) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Progress and Development Committee |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2023-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |