MO SB396 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the Attorney General reside at the seat of government
Title
Repeals the requirement that the Attorney General reside at the seat of government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 396-Wallingford |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=59162617 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB396.pdf |