MO SB387 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1804S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1804S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to the towing of commercial vehicles
Title
Enacts provisions relating to the towing of commercial vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1804S.03C) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | S First Read |