MO SB370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to MO HealthNet managed care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to MO HealthNet managed care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 370-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3511516 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB370.pdf |