MO SB367 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Show Missouri Film and Digital Media Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Show Missouri Film and Digital Media Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateHearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee
2021-02-16SenateHearing Cancelled S Economic Development Committee
2021-02-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee
2021-01-11SenateS First Read

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback