MO SB349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 349-Wasson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 349-Wasson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Missouri Works program
Title
Modifies the Missouri Works program
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 349-Wasson |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 349-Wasson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58176680 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB349.pdf |