MO SB342 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | No motion made to override Governor's veto |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed (1511S.04S) |
2013-05-17 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (1511S04.1SR) |
2013-05-17 | House | S motion to reconsider CCR adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | CCR S offered & defeated (1511S04.1SR) |
2013-05-16 | House | H submits CCR |
2013-05-16 | House | S conferees appointed: Parson, Kehoe, Cunningham, McKenna, LeVota |
2013-05-16 | House | H conferees appointed: Guernsey, McGaugh, Kelly-45 |
2013-05-16 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-16 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-16 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-15 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(1511H03.15H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(1511H03.16H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(1511H03.05H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(1511H03.22H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(1511H03.10H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(1511H03.28H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Guernsey)--(1511H03.25H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(1511H03.27H) |
2013-05-15 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (McGaugh)--(1511H03.26H) |
2013-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor - Consent |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - Consent |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2013-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 342-Parson, et al |