MO SB309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (1416S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (1416S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to prescribe and dispense nicotine replacement therapy products
Title
Authorizes pharmacists to prescribe and dispense nicotine replacement therapy products
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (1416S.03C) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 309-Sater |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2339135 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB309.pdf |