MO SB308 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 308-Schaaf
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 308-Schaaf
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plans to establish equal out-of-pocket requirements for oral anticancer medications and intravenously administered chemotherapy medications
Title
Requires health benefit plans to establish equal out-of-pocket requirements for oral anticancer medications and intravenously administered chemotherapy medications
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 308-Schaaf |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 308-Schaaf |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=18275821 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB308.pdf |