MO SB297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individuals 75 years of age or older to be excused from petit and grand jury service
Title
Allows individuals 75 years of age or older to be excused from petit and grand jury service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 297 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | HCS H defeated |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Criminal Justice |
2019-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Criminal Justice |
2019-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Criminal Justice |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Criminal Justice |
2019-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 297-White |