MO SB265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to workforce development in elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions related to workforce development in elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Education Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled |