MO SB254 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to motor vehicle license plates
Title
Modifies provisions relating to motor vehicle license plates
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCR#2 H adopted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-06 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (1424S06.1SR) |
2015-05-06 | House | Motion to adopt CCR S offered & withdrawn |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | H distributes CCR#2 (1424S06.1SR) |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-05 | House | H distributes CCR (1424S05.1SR) |
2015-04-29 | House | S conferees appointed: Kraus, Brown, Dixon, Holsman, Nasheed |
2015-04-29 | House | H conferees appointed: Davis, Jones, Allen, Conway (10), Kirkton |
2015-04-29 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-04-29 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-04-29 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-04-28 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(1424H02.07H) |
2015-04-28 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pietzman)--(1424H02.02H) |
2015-04-28 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(1424H02.01H) |
2015-04-28 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones 50)--(1424H02.06H) |
2015-04-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Veterans Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 254-Kraus |