MO SB222 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to motorized vehicles
Title
Modifies provisions relating to motorized vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 222 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 222 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 222 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 222 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 222 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 222 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 222 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0469S03.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (0469S03.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Riddle, Munzlinger, Hegeman, Hummel, Curls |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Korman, Reiboldt, Tate, McCreery, Razer |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 & HA 4, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 4, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Davis)--(0469S01.35H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 4 H offered (Korman)--(0469S01.17H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0469S01.18H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(0469S01.39H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(0469S01.33H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 222-Riddle |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |