MO SB189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 189-Crawford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 189-Crawford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to use taxes
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to use taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 189-Crawford, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0956S.06C) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 189-Crawford |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled |