MO SB15 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes tax credits for contributions to maternity homes and pregnancy resource centers
Title
Reauthorizes tax credits for contributions to maternity homes and pregnancy resource centers
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 15-Dixon |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095393 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB15.pdf |