MO SB139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 139 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 139 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 139 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 (HA 1 HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 (HA 2 HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 (*HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 139 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 139 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 (HA 1 HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 (HA 2 HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 (*HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 139 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0471S05.1SR) |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (0471S05.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Wood, Alferman, Haefner, Kendrick, Walker-74 |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Riddle, Rowden, Schupp, Sifton |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-09 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mathews)--(0471H04.33H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(0471H04.46H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Helms)--(0471H04.32H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Rowland)--(0471H04.14H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(0471H04.38H) |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Budget |
2017-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Budget |
2017-04-12 | House | Hearing Conducted H Budget |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred H Budget |
2017-03-13 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-09 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-09 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-03-07 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee, with SCS |
2017-02-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (0471S.02C) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 139-Sater |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |