MO SB136 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0508S.06C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0508S.06C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements that school districts conduct criminal background checks for persons having contact with students
Title
Modifies requirements that school districts conduct criminal background checks for persons having contact with students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0508S.06C) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |