MO SB130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the period of detention on arrest without a warrant to 48 hours
Title
Changes the period of detention on arrest without a warrant to 48 hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |