MO SB1247 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to electric utilities
Title
Creates provisions relating to electric utilities
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled |