MO SB119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 119-Schaefer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 119-Schaefer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assigns certain characteristics to the treatment of conservation easements under the law
Title
Assigns certain characteristics to the treatment of conservation easements under the law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 119-Schaefer | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-23 | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-18 | S First Read--SB 119-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4082037 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB119.pdf |