MO SB117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 153 & 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 153 & 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes roofing contractors in this state to register with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Title
Authorizes roofing contractors in this state to register with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 153 & 117) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 117-Cierpiot |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=48 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB117.pdf |