MO SB108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government |
2019-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government |
2019-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government |
2019-04-24 | House | Re-Referred H Downsizing State Government |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2019-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(0394S06.03S) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(0394S06.01S) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(0394S.06F) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0394S.05C) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0394S.05C) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 108-Koenig |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |