MO SB1047 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows cities, towns, or villages located in first or second class counties to consolidate if they meet certain conditions
Title
Allows cities, towns, or villages located in first or second class counties to consolidate if they meet certain conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1047-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27453052 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1047.pdf |