MO HR3899 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests certain actions be taken by the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation so that new chartered banks are established in Missouri
Title
Requests certain actions be taken by the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation so that new chartered banks are established in Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Owen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-05-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-05-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HR3899&year=2024&code=R |
Text | https://documents.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills241/hlrbillspdf/3527H.02I.pdf |