MO HJR92 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to the rejection of socialized single-payer health care.
Title
Adds provisions relating to the rejection of socialized single-payer health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Helms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-02-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |