MO HJR49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Senate, beginning January 1, 2021, to try all impeachments except for impeachment of the Governor, which shall be tried by the Chief Justice of the Missouri Supreme Court
Title
Requires the Senate, beginning January 1, 2021, to try all impeachments except for impeachment of the Governor, which shall be tried by the Chief Justice of the Missouri Supreme Court
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR49&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4287H.01I.pdf |