MO HJR40 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-18 - Referred: Elections (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-18 - Referred: Elections (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing the establishment of a Fair Ballot Commission to determine the propriety and correctness of proposed ballot language submitted by initiative or referendum
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing the establishment of a Fair Ballot Commission to determine the propriety and correctness of proposed ballot language submitted by initiative or referendum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-20 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR40&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HJR0040I.htm |