MO HJR2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment guaranteeing a citizen's right to pray and worship on public property and reaffirming a citizen's right to choose any or no religion
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment guaranteeing a citizen's right to pray and worship on public property and reaffirming a citizen's right to choose any or no religion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-28 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-04-21 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-21 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2011-03-10 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-10 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |