MO HJR11 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a Constitutional amendment that imposes a 2-term limitation on all statewide elected officials
Title
Proposes a Constitutional amendment that imposes a 2-term limitation on all statewide elected officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Withdrawn (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR11&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0997H.01I.pdf |