MO HCR73 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the Gold Star Families Memorial Monument at College of the Ozarks as the official Gold Star Families Memorial Monument of Missouri.
Title
Recognizes the Gold Star Families Memorial Monument at College of the Ozarks as the official Gold Star Families Memorial Monument of Missouri.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House: HCR 73 HCRs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate (S) |
2018-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |