MO HCR50 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Federal Emergency Management Agency to reimburse the city of Hannibal for expenses related to a natural disaster which occurred on May 20, 2013
Title
Urges the Federal Emergency Management Agency to reimburse the city of Hannibal for expenses related to a natural disaster which occurred on May 20, 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR50&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HCR0050I.htm |