MO HB979 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases various existing fees that are deposited in the county employees' retirement fund
Title
Increases various existing fees that are deposited in the county employees' retirement fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |