MO HB961 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a rotation list to be used by law enforcement when requesting wrecker or towing services and requires a towing company to remove debris from the road when responding to an accident
Title
Allows a rotation list to be used by law enforcement when requesting wrecker or towing services and requires a towing company to remove debris from the road when responding to an accident
Sponsors
Rep. Bert Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2011-04-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB961&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0961I.htm |