MO HB951 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the inspection of certain grounds or facilities in Missouri to enforce the laws of a state other than Missouri.
Title
Prohibits the inspection of certain grounds or facilities in Missouri to enforce the laws of a state other than Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Haden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House: HB 951 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2019, 2 p.m., SCR 2 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-16 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-16 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |