MO HB92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "First-Time Business Owner Savings Account" and authorizes a tax deduction for contributions to a savings account dedicated to starting a new business.
Title
Establishes the "First-Time Business Owner Savings Account" and authorizes a tax deduction for contributions to a savings account dedicated to starting a new business.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |